KS HB2017 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-18 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, January 18, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-18 - House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, January 18, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Vacancy elections; United States representative to congress.
Title
Vacancy elections; United States representative to congress.
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Esau [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-18 | House | House Approved by Governor on Wednesday, January 18, 2017 |
2017-01-18 | House | House Enrolled and presented to Governor on Wednesday, January 18, 2017 |
2017-01-18 | House | House Engrossed on Wednesday, January 18, 2017 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Senate Received and Introduced |
2017-01-12 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 1 |
2017-01-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-01-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carmichael was adopted |
2017-01-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carmichael |
2017-01-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2017-01-11 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Elections |
2017-01-10 | House | House Hearing and possible action: Tuesday, January 10, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 281-N |
2017-01-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Elections |
2017-01-09 | House | House Introduced |
2017-01-09 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Friday, January 06, 2017 |