KS HB2011 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-30 - House Hearing: Monday, January 30, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
Pending: House Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-30 - House Hearing: Monday, January 30, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
Pending: House Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a Kansas income tax subtraction modification for certain amounts received as compensation for members of the armed forces.
Title
Providing a Kansas income tax subtraction modification for certain amounts received as compensation for members of the armed forces.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | House | House Hearing: Monday, January 30, 2023, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2023-01-09 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2023-01-09 | House | House Introduced |
2023-01-09 | House | House Prefiled for Introduction on Friday, January 6, 2023 |