KS HB2007 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - House Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 18, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Senate Substitute for HB 2007 by Committee on Transportation - Authorizing certain toll projects for new projects or expanded capacity with approval from local units of government, the KTA and the state finance council; changing the requirement to fully fund toll projects solely through toll revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senate Substitute for HB 2007 by Committee on Transportation - Authorizing certain toll projects for new projects or expanded capacity with approval from local units of government, the KTA and the state finance council; changing the requirement to fully fund toll projects solely through toll revenue.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 90 Nay: 33 (Y: 90 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 117 Nay: 0 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HouseHouse Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 18, 2019
2019-05-01HouseHouse Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 9, 2019
2019-04-05HouseHouse Reengrossed on Friday, April 5, 2019
2019-04-05HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 90 Nay: 33
2019-04-04SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 1
2019-04-04SenateSenate Conference committee report now available
2019-04-01SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Petersen, Senator Goddard and Senator Pettey appointed as conferees
2019-04-01HouseHouse Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Proehl , Representative Thimesch and Representative Helgerson as conferees
2019-03-26SenateSenate Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 1
2019-03-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
2019-03-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Petersen was adopted
2019-03-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Petersen
2019-03-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2019-03-18SenateSenate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Transportation
2019-03-15SenateSenate Hearing: Friday, March 15, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
2019-02-26SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Transportation
2019-02-25SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-22HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 0
2019-02-22HouseHouse Engrossed on Thursday, February 21, 2019
2019-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carpenter, B. was withdrawn
2019-02-21HouseHouse Representative Frownfelter raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled germane.
2019-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carpenter, B.
2019-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-02-11HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Veterans and Military
2019-02-05HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, February 5, 2019, 9:00 AM Room 218-N
2019-01-25HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Transportation; Referred to Committee on Veterans and Military
2019-01-14HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-14HouseHouse Introduced
2019-01-14HouseHouse Prefiled for Introduction on Friday, January 4, 2019

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/hb2007/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2007_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2007_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2007_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2007_03_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/hb2007_enrolled.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190222110732_434903/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190326105805_313676/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190404160013_277694/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/vote_view/je_20190405111135_647327/

Bill Comments

feedback