KS HB2006 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Economic development program evaluations and disclosure of certain data; development incentives for rural housing shortage and rural housing incentive district bonds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic development program evaluations and disclosure of certain data; development incentives for rural housing shortage and rural housing incentive district bonds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce
2019-03-13SenateSenate Hearing continuation: Wednesday, March 13, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 548-S
2019-03-12SenateSenate Hearing continuation: Tuesday, March 12, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 548-S
2019-03-11SenateSenate Hearing: Monday, March 11, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 548-S
2019-02-28SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Commerce
2019-02-27SenateSenate Received and Introduced
2019-02-27HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 0
2019-02-26HouseHouse Engrossed on Tuesday, February 26, 2019
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ralph was adopted
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ralph
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-02-20HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
2019-01-31HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, January 31, 2019, 1:30 PM Room 112-N
2019-01-14HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
2019-01-14HouseHouse Introduced
2019-01-14HouseHouse Prefiled for Introduction on Friday, January 4, 2019

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback