KS HB2004 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - House Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the EV energy equity road repair tax act and providing for a road repair tax on electricity distributed from a public charging station for electric vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the EV energy equity road repair tax act and providing for a road repair tax on electricity distributed from a public charging station for electric vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-30HouseHouse Died in Committee
2023-01-31HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2023, 1:30 PM Room 582-N
2023-01-09HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Transportation
2023-01-09HouseHouse Introduced
2023-01-09HouseHouse Prefiled for Introduction on Tuesday, January 3, 2023

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback