KS H2564 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Accident and health insurance, excluding coverage for certain abortions. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Accident and health insurance, excluding coverage for certain abortions. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing: Thurs., 2/11/2010, 3:30PM, Rm 152-S | |
2010-01-29 | Referred to Insurance -HJ 848 | |
2010-01-28 | Introduced -HJ 842 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |