KS H2562 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Legal notice publication requirements reduced. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Legal notice publication requirements reduced. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2010-03-04 | Hearing: Thurs., 3/11/2010, 3:30 PM, Rm. 144-S | |
2010-01-29 | Referred to Local Government -HJ 848 | |
2010-01-28 | Introduced -HJ 842 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |