KS H2558 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Adding charitable contribution solicitations by professional solicitors to the Kansas no-call act. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Adding charitable contribution solicitations by professional solicitors to the Kansas no-call act. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing: Mon., 2/8/2010, 9:00 AM, Rm 785 Docking | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Energy and Utilities -HJ 842 | |
2010-01-27 | Introduced -HJ 840 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |