KS H2084 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in Senate committee
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in Senate committee
Summary
Cities; annexation; strip annexations restricted. Effective date: KS Register.
Title
Cities; annexation; strip annexations restricted. Effective date: KS Register.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in Senate committee | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Judiciary -SJ 337 | |
2009-03-16 | Received and introduced -SJ 327 | |
2009-03-16 | FA: Passed; Yeas 113 Nays 9 -HJ 299 | |
2009-03-13 | COW: Be passed -HJ 286 | |
2009-02-24 | Withdrawn from Appropriations -HJ 224; Referred to COW -HJ 224 | |
2009-02-20 | Withdrawn from calendar, referred to Appropriations -HJ 223 | |
2009-02-18 | CR: Be passed by Local Government -HJ 188 | |
2009-01-27 | Referred to Local Government -HJ 68 | |
2009-01-26 | Introduced -HJ 65 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |