KS H2055 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee

Summary

Health care for seniors fund; senior services fund; disposition of additional lottery proceeds. Effective date: Statute Bk.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care for seniors fund; senior services fund; disposition of additional lottery proceeds. Effective date: Statute Bk.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-28 Died in committee
2009-02-04 Hearing: Tues., 2/10/09, 3:30 PM, Rm 711 Docking
2009-01-23 Referred to Aging and Long-term Care -HJ 61
2009-01-22 Introduced -HJ 57

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback