KS H2049 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in committee
Summary
Hunter safety orientation programs in schools. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Title
Hunter safety orientation programs in schools. Effective date: Statute Bk.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in committee | |
2009-01-23 | Hearing: Thurs., 1/29/09, 3:30 PM, Rm 783 Docking | |
2009-01-22 | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources -HJ 60 | |
2009-01-21 | Introduced -HJ 54 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/legsrv-billtrack/searchBills.do |