IN SR0061 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Senator Delph added as coauthor.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Senator Delph added as coauthor.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A SENATE RESOLUTION urging the Legislative Council to assign to the appropriate study committee the topic of the feasibility and necessity of a wilderness preservation system for Indiana's public lands
Title
A SENATE RESOLUTION urging the Legislative Council to assign to the appropriate study committee the topic of the feasibility and necessity of a wilderness preservation system for Indiana's public lands
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senator Delph added as coauthor. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as coauthor. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as coauthor. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senator Skinner added as coauthor. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senator Broden added as coauthor. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as coauthor. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senator Walker added as coauthor. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senator Wyss added as coauthor. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senator Nugent added as coauthor. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as coauthor. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as coauthor. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senator Paul added as coauthor. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senator Boots added as coauthor. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Becker added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Bray added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Alting added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as coauthor. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senator Pat Miller added as coauthor. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senator Waterman added as coauthor. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senator R. Young added as coauthor. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Steele. |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/resolutions/senate/simple/61/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/6/4/b9644c86/SR0061.01.INTR.pdf |