IN SR0054 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Second reading: adopted voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging Legislative Council to require DCS to report to HFC.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging Legislative Council to require DCS to report to HFC.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-06 Second reading: adopted voice vote
2012-03-01 Senators Becker and Leising added as coauthors
2012-03-01 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2012-02-27 Senator Delph added as second author
2012-02-23 First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2012-02-23 Authored by Senator Miller

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback