IN SR0039 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Second reading: adopted; Division of the Senate: yeas 29, nays 10.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A SENATE RESOLUTION urging the legislative council to assign the topic of the common construction wage to the appropriate committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A SENATE RESOLUTION urging the legislative council to assign the topic of the common construction wage to the appropriate committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Pensions and Labor - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-03SenateSecond reading: adopted; Division of the Senate: yeas 29, nays 10.
2014-02-27SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-02-20SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Pensions and Labor
2014-02-17SenateAuthored by Senator Boots.

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback