IN SR0032 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Second reading: adopted voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Second reading: adopted voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A SENATE RESOLUTION urging the legislative council to assign to the appropriate study committee the topic of spousal support and educational support.
Title
A SENATE RESOLUTION urging the legislative council to assign to the appropriate study committee the topic of spousal support and educational support.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Delph [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Joseph Zakas [R] |
Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Rodric Bray [R] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senators Koch, Zakas, Freeman, Bray, Taylor G added as coauthors |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-22 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Authored by Senator Delph |