IN SR0017 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Senator Randolph added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Senator Randolph added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A SENATE RESOLUTION supporting Taiwan's signing of a Bilateral Trade Agreement with the United States, reaffirming Indiana's commitment to strengthening and deepening of the sister ties between Indiana and Taiwan, and continuing to support an increase in Taiwan's international profile.
Title
A SENATE RESOLUTION supporting Taiwan's signing of a Bilateral Trade Agreement with the United States, reaffirming Indiana's commitment to strengthening and deepening of the sister ties between Indiana and Taiwan, and continuing to support an increase in Taiwan's international profile.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-02-18 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Authored by Senators Young M and Ford Jon |