IN SR0014 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Senator Randolph added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Senator Randolph added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A SENATE RESOLUTION urging the legislative council to establish a study committee to study issues related to the Department of Child Services.
Title
A SENATE RESOLUTION urging the legislative council to establish a study committee to study issues related to the Department of Child Services.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Melton [D] | Sen. Erin Houchin [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] |
Sen. John Crane [R] | Sen. Mark Stoops [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senator Crane added as coauthor |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senators Houchin, Kruse, Breaux added as coauthors |
2018-01-29 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Authored by Senator Melton |