IN SR0013 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Senator Randolph added as coauthor.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Senator Randolph added as coauthor.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A SENATE RESOLUTION urging the legislative council to assign to the Criminal Law and Sentencing Policy Study Committee the topic of regulation of adult service advertisements on the Internet and in newspapers.
Title
A SENATE RESOLUTION urging the legislative council to assign to the Criminal Law and Sentencing Policy Study Committee the topic of regulation of adult service advertisements on the Internet and in newspapers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Commerce, Economic Development & Technology |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Authored by Senator Waterman. |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/resolutions/senate/simple/13/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/1/d/151d9457/SR0013.01.INTR.pdf |