IN SR0002 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Senator Crane added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Senator Crane added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A SENATE RESOLUTION urging the government of Turkey to cease its discrimination against the Ecumenical Patriarchate of the Orthodox Christian Church, to grant the Ecumenical Patriarch appropriate international recognition, ecclesiastical succession, and the right to train clergy of all nationalities, and to respect the property rights and human rights of the Ecumenical Patriarchate.
Title
A SENATE RESOLUTION urging the government of Turkey to cease its discrimination against the Ecumenical Patriarchate of the Orthodox Christian Church, to grant the Ecumenical Patriarch appropriate international recognition, ecclesiastical succession, and the right to train clergy of all nationalities, and to respect the property rights and human rights of the Ecumenical Patriarchate.
Sponsors
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Michael Delph [R] | Sen. Susan Glick [R] | Sen. Rick Niemeyer [R] |
Sen. Rick Niemeyer [R] | Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. John Crane [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senator Crane added as coauthor |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as coauthor |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senator Glick added as third author |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senator Delph added as second author |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senator Niemeyer added as coauthor |
2017-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Randolph Lonnie M |