IN SCR0053 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION recognizing the significance of the construction of the Vietnam Memorial Wall at the Veterans National Memorial Shrine and Museum in Fort Wayne, Indiana.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION recognizing the significance of the construction of the Vietnam Memorial Wall at the Veterans National Memorial Shrine and Museum in Fort Wayne, Indiana.
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R] | Sen. Justin Busch [R] | Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] | Rep. Christopher Judy [R] |
Rep. Robert Morris [R] | Rep. Philip GiaQuinta [D] | Rep. David Abbott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Returned to the Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Judy, Morris, GiaQuinta, Abbott D |
2020-02-27 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Carbaugh |
2020-02-27 | Senate | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Authored by Senators Brown L and Busch |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/resolutions/senate/concurrent/53/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/0/0/3f001602/SC0053.01.INTR.pdf |