IN SCR0050 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Study committee on closure notice to government of proposed highway projects.
Title
Study committee on closure notice to government of proposed highway projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Returned to the Senate | |
2011-04-27 | First reading: adopted voice vote | |
2011-04-18 | Cosponsor: Rep. Cherry | |
2011-04-18 | House sponsor: Rep. R. Frye | |
2011-04-18 | Referred to the House | |
2011-04-18 | Second reading: adopted voice vote | |
2011-04-12 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-04-04 | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce & Economic Development | |
2011-04-04 | Authored by Senators Leising and Gard |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2011&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SCR&docno=0050 |
Text | http://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/SRESF/SC0050.html |