IN SCR0040 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-11)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Referred to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION memorializing Sergeant Benton "Ben" Bertram and urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to name a mile of State Road 56 near Scottsburg the "Sgt. Ben Bertram Memorial Mile".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION memorializing Sergeant Benton "Ben" Bertram and urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to name a mile of State Road 56 near Scottsburg the "Sgt. Ben Bertram Memorial Mile".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - House - House Floor - (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateReferred to the House
2019-03-14SenateSenators Alting, Bassler, Becker, Bohacek, Boots, Bray, Breaux, Brown L, Buchanan, Buck, Busch, Charbonneau, Crane, Doriot, Ford J.D., Ford Jon, Freeman, Gaskill, Glick, Grooms, Head, Holdman, Houchin, Koch, Kruse, Lanane, Leising, Melton, Merritt, Messmer, Mishler, Mrvan, Niemeyer, Niezgodski, Perfect, Raatz, Randolph, Rogers, Ruckelshaus, Sandlin, Spartz, Stoops, Tallian, Taylor G, Tomes, Walker, Young M, Zay added as coauthors
2019-03-14SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Goodin
2019-03-14SenateSecond reading: adopted standing vote
2019-03-12SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-03-07SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2019-03-07SenateAuthored by Senators Garten and Crider

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/resolutions/senate/concurrent/40
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/e/5/4/6e544542/SC0040.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/e/c/2dec0888/SC0040.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/2/f/622fbee2/SC0040.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/3/9/b539f863/SC0040.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/e/b/b/6ebbc8d3/SC0040.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/a/f/f0af6c10/SC0040.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/e/9/c/3e9c2bb2/SC0040.04.COMH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/2/7/68275431/SC0040.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/4/b/774bcbb3/SC0040.03.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/d/f/42df1a37/SC0040.416.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback