IN SCR0037 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION recognizing Earl Smith, Jr. on his induction into the 2018 Indiana Basketball Hall of Fame.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION recognizing Earl Smith, Jr. on his induction into the 2018 Indiana Basketball Hall of Fame.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | House | Returned to the Senate |
2018-02-26 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-22 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Brown C |
2018-02-22 | Senate | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Authored by Senator Melton |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2018/resolutions/senate/concurrent/37/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/a/2/f8a20ec6/SC0037.01.INTR.pdf |