IN SCR0032 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-04 - First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename the bridge over Interstate 65 at State Road 38 as the "Mark S. Davis Memorial Bridge".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename the bridge over Interstate 65 at State Road 38 as the "Mark S. Davis Memorial Bridge".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-04HouseFirst reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation
2017-03-30SenateReferred to the House
2017-03-30SenateCosponsors: Representatives Brown, T. and Klinker
2017-03-30SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Siegrist
2017-03-30SenateSecond reading: adopted voice vote
2017-03-28SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2017-03-13SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2017-03-13SenateAuthored by Senators Hershman and Alting

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback