IN SCR0031 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 41-21)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 41-21)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Honoring Barbara Boyd. A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring the lifetime achievements of Indianapolis journalist Barbara Boyd.
Title
Honoring Barbara Boyd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | House | Returned to the Senate |
2023-03-21 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senators Alexander, Alting, Baldwin, Bassler, Becker, Bohacek, Bray, Brown L, Buchanan, Buck, Busch, Byrne, Charbonneau, Crane, Deery, Dernulc, Donato, Doriot, Ford Jon, Freeman, Garten, Gaskill, Glick, Holdman, Johnson, Koch, Leising, Melton, Messmer, Mishler, Niemeyer, Niezgodski, Perfect, Pol, Raatz, Randolph, Rogers, Sandlin, Tomes, Walker G, Yoder, Young M, Zay added as coauthors |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Gore, Hamilton, Garcia Wilburn V, Andrade M, Bartlett, Pryor, Summers, Porter, DeLaney, Shackleford, McGuire J |
2023-03-14 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Pack |
2023-03-14 | Senate | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senators Breaux, Crider, Hunley, Qaddoura |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Authored by Senators Ford J.D., Walker K, Taylor G |
Subjects
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2023/resolutions/senate/concurrent/31 |
Text | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2023/resolutions/senate/concurrent/31#1.INTR |