IN SCR0030 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Senator Rogers added as third author
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Senator Rogers added as third author
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring the Morris Performing Arts Center on its 100th anniversary.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring the Morris Performing Arts Center on its 100th anniversary.
Sponsors
Sen. David Niezgodski [D] | Sen. Ryan Mishler [R] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Rep. Maureen Bauer [D] |
Rep. Ryan Dvorak [D] | Rep. Jake Teshka [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as third author |
2022-02-23 | House | Returned to the Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2022-02-22 | House | Representatives Dvorak and Teshka J added as cosponsors |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-17 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Bauer M |
2022-02-17 | Senate | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Authored by Senators Niezgodski and Mishler |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2022/resolutions/senate/concurrent/30/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/5/b/9e5b2ac6/SC0030.01.INTR.pdf |