IN SCR0024 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing the 100th anniversary of IU Health Morgan. A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION recognizing the 100th anniversary of Indiana University Health Morgan ("IU Health Morgan").
Title
Recognizing the 100th anniversary of IU Health Morgan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Returned to the Senate |
2024-03-04 | House | First reading: adopted |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2024-02-27 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Mayfield |
2024-02-27 | Senate | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bray |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2024/resolutions/senate/concurrent/24/details |
Text | https://iga.in.gov/pdf-documents/123/2024/senate/resolutions/SC0024/SC0024.01.INTR.pdf |