IN SCR0019 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION memorializing First Lady Susan Bayh.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION memorializing First Lady Susan Bayh.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14HouseReturned to the Senate
2021-04-13HouseFirst reading: adopted voice vote
2021-04-12HouseRepresentatives Andrade M, Austin, Bartlett, Bauer M, Boy, Campbell, DeLaney, Dvorak, Fleming, GiaQuinta, Gore M, Hamilton, Harris, Hatcher, Hatfield, Jackson, Johnson, Klinker, Moed, Moseley, Pack R, Pfaff, Pierce, Porter, Pryor, Shackleford, Smith, V., Summers added as cosponsors
2021-04-05SenateReferred to the House
2021-04-01SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Errington
2021-04-01SenateFirst reading: adopted standing vote
2021-04-01SenateCoauthored by Senators Taylor G, Melton, Ford J.D., Lanane, Breaux, Randolph Lonnie M, Tallian, Qaddoura, Niezgodski, Mrvan
2021-04-01SenateAuthored by Senator Yoder

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback