IN SCR0016 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of assessing the laws and policies concerning the adjudication and rehabilitation of juvenile offenders.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of assessing the laws and policies concerning the adjudication and rehabilitation of juvenile offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | Returned to the Senate |
2019-03-05 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Goodrich |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as second author |
2019-01-28 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Authored by Senator Spartz |