IN SCR0015 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the establishment of the Office of Outdoor Recreation Development within the Indiana Destination Development Corporation.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the establishment of the Office of Outdoor Recreation Development within the Indiana Destination Development Corporation.
Sponsors
Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. Justin Busch [R] | Sen. Susan Glick [R] |
Sen. Timothy Lanane [D] | Rep. Christy Stutzman [R] | Rep. Doug Miller [R] | Rep. Jack Jordan [R] |
Rep. Tonya Pfaff [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House - Second reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Returned to the Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Second reading: adopted Roll Call 317: yeas 87, nays 0 |
2020-02-27 | House | Representative Pfaff added as cosponsor |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-13 | House | First reading: referred to the Committee on Natural Resources |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senators Glick and Lanane added as coauthors |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Miller and Jordan |
2020-02-03 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Stutzman |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Busch added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Authored by Senators Doriot and Rogers |