IN SCR0015 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Study committee on impact of national health care bill on Indiana.
Title
Study committee on impact of national health care bill on Indiana.
Sponsors
Sen. Vi Simpson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | Referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures | |
2010-02-02 | House sponsor: Rep. C. Brown | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the House | |
2010-02-02 | Second reading: adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-01-28 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-14 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | |
2010-01-14 | Authored by Senator Simpson |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2010&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SCR&docno=0015 |
Text | http://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2010/SRESF/SC0015.html |