IN SCR0014 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on February 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on February 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-15 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to name the bridge crossing Blue Lick Creek on US 31 near Memphis, Indiana, the "Corporal Jordan L. Spears Memorial Bridge".
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to name the bridge crossing Blue Lick Creek on US 31 near Memphis, Indiana, the "Corporal Jordan L. Spears Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Garten [R] | Sen. John Crane [R] | Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. Michael Crider [R] |
Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Rep. Shane Lindauer [R] | Rep. Zach Payne [R] | Rep. Karen Engleman [R] |
Rep. Rita Fleming [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - House - House - Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Returned to the Senate |
2022-02-14 | House | Second reading: adopted Roll Call 173: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2022-02-14 | House | Representative Fleming added as cosponsor |
2022-02-10 | House | Representative Engleman added as cosponsor |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-02-07 | House | First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Payne Z |
2022-01-31 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Lindauer |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Second reading: adopted standing vote |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senators Tomes, Crider, Boots added as coauthors |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senator Crane added as second author |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-18 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Authored by Senator Garten |