IN SCR0010 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION congratulating the Reitz Memorial High School boys soccer team on winning the 2020 Indiana High School Athletic Association ("IHSAA") Class 2A state championship.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION congratulating the Reitz Memorial High School boys soccer team on winning the 2020 Indiana High School Athletic Association ("IHSAA") Class 2A state championship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | House | Returned to the Senate |
2021-02-17 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2021-02-11 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Hatfield |
2021-02-11 | Senate | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Authored by Senators Becker and Tomes |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/resolutions/senate/concurrent/10/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/9/0/44901add/SC0010.01.INTR.pdf |