IN SCR0007 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 84-26)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - Representatives Bosma, Abbott D, Austin, Aylesworth, Baird, Bartels, Bartlett, Bauer, Beck, Behning, Boy, Brown, T., Burton, Campbell, Cherry, Chyung, Clere, Cook, Davisson, Deal, DeLaney, DeVon, Dvorak, Eberhart, Ellington, Engleman, Errington, Frye, GiaQuinta, Goodin, Hamilton, Harris, Heaton, Heine, Huston, Jordan, Karickhoff, Lauer, Lehman, Leonard, Lindauer, Lucas, Manning, May, Mayfield, McNamara, Morris, Negele, Prescott, Schaibley, Sherman D, Smaltz, Soliday, Speedy, Stutzman, Thompson, Vermilion A, Zent, Ziemke added as cosponsors
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring Indiana University in recognition of its Bicentennial Anniversary on January 20, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring Indiana University in recognition of its Bicentennial Anniversary on January 20, 2020.

Sponsors

Sen. Eric Koch [R]Sen. Mark Stoops [D]Sen. Ronnie Alting [R]Sen. Eric Bassler [R]
Sen. Vaneta Becker [R]Sen. Mike Bohacek [R]Sen. Philip Boots [R]Sen. Rodric Bray [R]
Sen. Jean Breaux [D]Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R]Sen. Brian Buchanan [R]Sen. James Buck [R]
Sen. Justin Busch [R]Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R]Sen. John Crane [R]Sen. Michael Crider [R]
Sen. Stacey Donato [R]Sen. Blake Doriot [R]Sen. J.D. Ford [D]Sen. Jon Ford [R]
Sen. Aaron Freeman [R]Sen. Chris Garten [R]Sen. Mike Gaskill [R]Sen. Susan Glick [R]
Sen. Ronald Grooms [R]Sen. Travis Holdman [R]Sen. Erin Houchin [R]Sen. Dennis Kruse [R]
Sen. Timothy Lanane [D]Sen. Jean Leising [R]Sen. Eddie Melton [D]Sen. James Merritt [R]
Sen. Mark Messmer [R]Sen. Ryan Mishler [R]Sen. Frank Mrvan [D]Sen. Rick Niemeyer [R]
Sen. David Niezgodski [D]Sen. Clyde Perfect [R]Sen. Jeff Raatz [R]Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D]
Sen. Linda Rogers [R]Sen. John Ruckelshaus [R]Sen. Jack Sandlin [R]Sen. Victoria Spartz [R]
Sen. Karen Tallian [D]Sen. Greg Taylor [D]Sen. James Tomes [R]Sen. Greg Walker [R]
Sen. Michael Young [R]Sen. Andy Zay [R]Rep. Matt Pierce [D]Rep. Brian Bosma [R]
Rep. David Abbott [R]Rep. Terri Jo Austin [D]Rep. Micheal Aylesworth [R]Rep. Beau Baird [R]
Rep. Steve Bartels [R]Rep. John Bartlett [D]Rep. Patrick Bauer [D]Rep. Lisa Beck [D]
Rep. Robert Behning [R]Rep. Pat Boy [D]Rep. Timothy Brown [R]Rep. Charles Burton [R]
Rep. Chris Campbell [D]Rep. Robert Cherry [R]Rep. Chris Chyung [D]Rep. Edward Clere [R]
Rep. Anthony Cook [R]Rep. Steven Davisson [R]Rep. Ross Deal [D]Rep. Edward DeLaney [D]
Rep. Dale DeVon [R]Rep. Ryan Dvorak [D]Rep. Sean Eberhart [R]Rep. Jeff Ellington [R]
Rep. Karen Engleman [R]Rep. Sue Errington [D]Rep. Randall Frye [R]Rep. Philip GiaQuinta [D]
Rep. Terry Goodin [D]Rep. Carey Hamilton [D]Rep. Earl Harris [D]Rep. Robert Heaton [R]
Rep. Dave Heine [R]Rep. Todd Huston [R]Rep. Jack Jordan [R]Rep. Michael Karickhoff [R]
Rep. Ryan Lauer [R]Rep. Matthew Lehman [R]Rep. Daniel Leonard [R]Rep. Shane Lindauer [R]
Rep. Jim Lucas [R]Rep. Ethan Manning [R]Rep. Chris May [R]Rep. Peggy Mayfield [R]
Rep. Wendy McNamara [R]Rep. Robert Morris [R]Rep. Sharon Negele [R]Rep. John Prescott [R]
Rep. Donna Schaibley [R]Rep. Dollyne Sherman [R]Rep. Ben Smaltz [R]Rep. Edmond Soliday [R]
Rep. Mike Speedy [R]Rep. Christy Stutzman [R]Rep. Jeffrey Thompson [R]Rep. Ann Vermilion [R]
Rep. Dennis Zent [R]Rep. Cindy Ziemke [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-28HouseRepresentatives Bosma, Abbott D, Austin, Aylesworth, Baird, Bartels, Bartlett, Bauer, Beck, Behning, Boy, Brown, T., Burton, Campbell, Cherry, Chyung, Clere, Cook, Davisson, Deal, DeLaney, DeVon, Dvorak, Eberhart, Ellington, Engleman, Errington, Frye, GiaQuinta, Goodin, Hamilton, Harris, Heaton, Heine, Huston, Jordan, Karickhoff, Lauer, Lehman, Leonard, Lindauer, Lucas, Manning, May, Mayfield, McNamara, Morris, Negele, Prescott, Schaibley, Sherman D, Smaltz, Soliday, Speedy, Stutzman, Thompson, Vermilion A, Zent, Ziemke added as cosponsors
2020-01-21HouseReturned to the Senate
2020-01-16HouseFirst reading: adopted voice vote
2020-01-16SenateReferred to the House
2020-01-16SenateSenators Alting, Bassler, Becker, Bohacek, Boots, Bray, Breaux, Brown L, Buchanan, Buck, Busch, Charbonneau, Crane, Crider, Donato, Doriot, Ford J.D., Ford Jon, Freeman, Garten, Gaskill, Glick, Grooms, Holdman, Houchin, Kruse, Lanane, Leising, Melton, Merritt, Messmer, Mishler, Mrvan, Niemeyer, Niezgodski, Perfect, Raatz, Randolph, Rogers, Ruckelshaus, Sandlin, Spartz, Tallian, Taylor G, Tomes, Walker, Young M, Zay added as coauthors
2020-01-16SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Pierce
2020-01-16SenateFirst reading: adopted voice vote
2020-01-16SenateAuthored by Senators Koch and Stoops

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback