IN SCR0005 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 45-11)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Representative Barrett added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Urging INDOT to rename a section of SR13 in Madison County, the "Officer Noah Jacob Shahnavaz Memorial Mile". A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to rename a section of State Road 13 in Madison County, beginning at 1795 South Anderson Street and ending one mile south on State Road 13, the "Officer Noah Jacob Shahnavaz Memorial Mile".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging INDOT to rename a section of SR13 in Madison County, the "Officer Noah Jacob Shahnavaz Memorial Mile".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-20 - House - House - Second reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-21HouseRepresentative Barrett added as cosponsor
2023-03-21HouseReturned to the Senate
2023-03-20HouseRepresentative Garcia Wilburn V added as cosponsor
2023-03-20HouseSecond reading: adopted Roll Call 269: yeas 95, nays 0
2023-03-16HouseRepresentative Vermilion A added as cosponsor
2023-03-14HouseRepresentatives Huston and added as cosponsors
2023-03-14HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2023-02-27HouseFirst reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation
2023-02-21SenateReferred to the House
2023-02-20SenateSenators Alexander, Alting, Bassler, Becker, Bohacek, Bray, Breaux, Brown L, Buchanan, Buck, Busch, Byrne, Charbonneau, Crane, Crider, Deery, Dernulc, Donato, Doriot, Ford J.D., Ford Jon, Freeman, Garten, Glick, Holdman, Hunley, Johnson, Koch, Leising, Melton, Messmer, Mishler, Niemeyer, Niezgodski, Perfect, Pol, Qaddoura, Raatz, Randolph, Rogers, Sandlin, Taylor G, Tomes, Walker G, Yoder, Young M, Zay added as coauthors
2023-02-20SenateCosponsor: Representative Lindauer
2023-02-20SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Rowray
2023-02-20SenateSecond reading: adopted standing vote
2023-02-14SenateSenator Walker K added as third author
2023-02-09SenateSenator Baldwin added as second author
2023-02-07SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2023-01-23SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2023-01-23SenateAuthored by Senator Gaskill

Subjects


Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback