IN SCR0005 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION memorializing Sgt. Major Jeffrey Shera and urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to place signs on SR 121 outside of Laurel, IN honoring Sgt. Major Shera's life and accomplishments.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION memorializing Sgt. Major Jeffrey Shera and urging the Indiana Department of Transportation to place signs on SR 121 outside of Laurel, IN honoring Sgt. Major Shera's life and accomplishments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Ziemke |
2018-02-19 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Lyness |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Second reading: adopted standing vote |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-18 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Authored by Senators Leising and Raatz |