IN SCR0004 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Passed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Passed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring the work of the United Association of Union Plumbers, Pipefitters, Welders, Sprinklefitters and Service Techs of the United States and Canada on their Veterans in Piping Program.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION honoring the work of the United Association of Union Plumbers, Pipefitters, Welders, Sprinklefitters and Service Techs of the United States and Canada on their Veterans in Piping Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | House | Returned to the Senate |
2018-01-31 | House | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senator Brown L added as coauthor |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senators Lanane, Tallian, Messmer, Charbonneau, Ford, Bohacek, Crider, Glick, Koch, Smith J, Randolph, Zakas added as coauthors |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Zent and Baird |
2018-01-29 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Macer |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Second reading: adopted voice vote |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senators Niemeyer and Sandlin added as coauthors |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and The Military |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Authored by Senators Niezgodski and Delph |