IN SB0373 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 15 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Dissent withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal trespass and application fraud.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal trespass and application fraud.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-15 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 65 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Senate - Senate - Roll Call 563 (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate - Roll Call 225 (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-26SenateDissent withdrawn
2013-04-26SenateConference committee report 2 : withdrawn
2013-04-26SenateRules suspended
2013-04-26HouseHouse consideration of CCR-2: call withdrawn
2013-04-26HouseRules suspended
2013-04-26SenateConference committee report 2 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 563: yeas 29, nays 21
2013-04-26SenateRules suspended
2013-04-26SenateConference committee report 1 : withdrawn
2013-04-25SenateSenator Steele added as conferee
2013-04-25SenateSenator Steele removed as advisor
2013-04-25SenateSenator Tallian removed as conferee
2013-04-25HouseRepresentative Steuerwald added as conferee
2013-04-25HouseRepresentative Steuerwald removed as House advisor
2013-04-25HouseRepresentative Bauer removed as conferee
2013-04-17HouseHouse advisors appointed: Lehe, Steuerwald, McMillin, Niezgodski and Pierce
2013-04-17HouseHouse conferees appointed: Friend and Bauer
2013-04-16SenateSenate advisors appointed: Steele, Stoops and Bray
2013-04-16SenateSenate conferee appointed: Holdman and Tallian
2013-04-16SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2013-04-15HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2013-04-15HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 493: yeas 65, nays 25
2013-04-11HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2013-04-09HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-04-01HouseRecommitted to Committee on Judiciary
2013-04-01HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-03-12HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
2013-02-26SenateCosponsor: Rep. Lehe
2013-02-26SenateHouse sponsor: Rep. Friend
2013-02-26SenateReferred to the House
2013-02-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 225: yeas 30 and nays 20
2013-02-25SenateAmendment 2 (Holdman), prevailed; voice vote
2013-02-25SenateReread second time: amended and ordered engrossed
2013-02-21SenateSenator Steele added as second author
2013-02-21SenatePlaced back on second reading
2013-02-19SenateAmendment 1 (Holdman), prevailed; voice vote
2013-02-19SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-02-14SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-01-08SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law
2013-01-08SenateAuthored by Senator Holdman

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback