IN SB0101 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-14 - Public Law 21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adds causing property damage to an agricultural operation to the existing crime of institutional criminal mischief. Increases the sentence enhancement monetary thresholds for criminal mischief and institutional criminal mischief. Provides that a person commits criminal trespass if, without the owner's permission, the person enters: (1) that portion of an agricultural operation that is used for production; or (2) any part of the real property of an agricultural operation and causes property damage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agricultural operations and trespass.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-24 - House - House Floor - (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Floor - (Y: 25 N: 59 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2014-02-17 - House - House Committee on Judiciary - Roll Call 010103 (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-07 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Roll Call 010101 (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-14SenatePublic Law 21
2014-03-14SenateSigned by the Governor
2014-03-05SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-05SenateSigned by the Speaker
2014-02-24HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2014-02-24HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 247: yeas 73 and nays 25
2014-02-20HouseSecond reading: engrossed.
2014-02-20HouseSB 101 Amendment #1 (DeLaney), failed.
2014-02-20HouseRepresentative Steuerwald added as cosponsor.
2014-02-20HouseRepresentative McMillin added as sponsor.
2014-02-20HouseRepresentative Steuerwald removed as sponsor.
2014-02-18HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted.
2014-02-10HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Judiciary
2014-01-30SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor.
2014-01-30SenateRepresentative Steuerwald added as sponsor.
2014-01-30SenateReferred to the House
2014-01-30SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 85: yeas 41 and nays 5
2014-01-28SenateSB 101 Amendment #2 (Holdman), prevailed.
2014-01-28SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2014-01-23SenateCommittee report; amend do pass; adopted
2014-01-16SenateSenator R. Young added as coauthor.
2014-01-13SenateSenator Steele added as second author.
2014-01-07SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Corrections & Criminal Law
2014-01-07SenateAuthored by Senator Holdman

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/senate/101/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/8/b/0/d8b07251/SB0101.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/5/e/495efe0d/SB0101.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/e/4/01e4e1ea/SB0101.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/6/0/62601aa5/SB0101.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/6/8/2068b6c9/SB0101.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/8/6/c2861110/SB0101.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/1/d/cf1d64b5/SB0101.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/1/9/c819f082/SB0101.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/f/7/83f79acb/SB0101.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/d/9/2cd97187/SB0101.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/1/d/a/31dab032/SB0101.03.COMS.85.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/1/0/f/f10faf58/SB0101.03.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/a/6/9da620b2/SB0101.04.COMH.239.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/3/b/323b32f6/SB0101.04.COMH.247.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback