IN SB0621 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 42
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 42
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Nonprofit property tax exemption. Provides a property tax exemption to a nonprofit corporation that owns real property in Marion County that was acquired for the primary purpose of using the real property as part of a community redevelopment project in an economically distressed area.
Title
Nonprofit property tax exemption. Provides a property tax exemption to a nonprofit corporation that owns real property in Marion County that was acquired for the primary purpose of using the real property as part of a community redevelopment project in an economically distressed area.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Sen. John Ruckelshaus [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Gregory Porter [D] |
Rep. Mike Speedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Public Law 42 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-03-27 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2019-03-26 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 358: yeas 88, nays 3 |
2019-03-25 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-03-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Speedy |
2019-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Porter |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 72: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senator Ruckelshaus added as second author |
2019-01-15 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Authored by Senator Breaux |