IN SB0616 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 58
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 58
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the health finance commission to study during the 2013 legislative interim the coordination and efficiency of the collection, maintenance, sharing, and use of electronic health data in Indiana.
Title
Study of electronic medical records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-25 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 58 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-03-25 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2013-03-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 335: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2013-03-21 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-18 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-03-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Cosponsor: Rep. Shackleford |
2013-02-26 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Clere |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 247: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as coauthor |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senator Pat Miller added as second author |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-17 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Authored by Senator Breaux |