IN SB0609 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Public Law 279
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Alcohol matters. For purposes of the law regarding farm wineries, specifies that: (1) "bottle" means a standard wine container that meets the design, fill, and headspace requirements under federal law; and (2) "bulk", with regard to bulk wine purchases and sales, means a container of more than 60 liters. Allows a farm winery permit holder or an artisan distiller's permit holder to: (1) be the proprietor of a restaurant; (2) transfer wine or liquor from the farm winery or artisan distillery to the restaurant; (3) have a window between the farm winery or artisan distillery and the restaurant; and (4) have a doorway or other opening between the farm winery or artisan distillery and the restaurant. Provides that the restaurant of a microbrewery, farm winery, or artisan distillery is not required to sell the minimum amount of food required to provide separation between the bar area and the family room by means of a structure or barrier (instead of providing separation by a nontransparent wall). Provides that a minor may be on the premises of a farm winery under certain circumstances. Allows the holder of a retailer's (restaurant) permit to have an interest in an artisan distiller's permit and a farm winery permit. Allows distillers and rectifiers to have an interest in a beer permit. Repeals the crime prohibiting artisan distillers, distillers, and rectifiers from owning stock of a corporation that holds a retailer's permit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcohol matters. For purposes of the law regarding farm wineries, specifies that: (1) "bottle" means a standard wine container that meets the design, fill, and headspace requirements under federal law; and (2) "bulk", with regard to bulk wine purchases and sales, means a container of more than 60 liters. Allows a farm winery permit holder or an artisan distiller's permit holder to: (1) be the proprietor of a restaurant; (2) transfer wine or liquor from the farm winery or artisan distillery to the restaurant; (3) have a window between the farm winery or artisan distillery and the restaurant; and (4) have a doorway or other opening between the farm winery or artisan distillery and the restaurant. Provides that the restaurant of a microbrewery, farm winery, or artisan distillery is not required to sell the minimum amount of food required to provide separation between the bar area and the family room by means of a structure or barrier (instead of providing separation by a nontransparent wall). Provides that a minor may be on the premises of a farm winery under certain circumstances. Allows the holder of a retailer's (restaurant) permit to have an interest in an artisan distiller's permit and a farm winery permit. Allows distillers and rectifiers to have an interest in a beer permit. Repeals the crime prohibiting artisan distillers, distillers, and rectifiers from owning stock of a corporation that holds a retailer's permit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenatePublic Law 279
2019-05-06SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-24HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 644: yeas 88, nays 6
2019-04-24SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 602: yeas 44, nays 5
2019-04-24HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2019-04-24SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2019-04-18SenateSenate advisors appointed: Garten and Randolph Lonnie M
2019-04-18SenateSenate conferees appointed: Grooms and Taylor G
2019-04-17HouseHouse advisors appointed: Saunders, Smaltz, Fleming and Summers
2019-04-17HouseHouse conferees appointed: Clere and Moed
2019-04-17SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2019-04-17SenateMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-12HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-04-11HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 496: yeas 76, nays 14
2019-04-10HouseAmendment #2 (Clere) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-10HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2019-02-22SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-21SenateSenator Buck added as coauthor
2019-02-21SenateCosponsors: Representatives Engleman, Fleming and Lehman
2019-02-21SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Clere
2019-02-21SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 178: yeas 43, nays 6
2019-02-19SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-18SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-02-14SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-15SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2019-01-15SenateAuthored by Senators Grooms and Garten

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/609/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/1/4/7c14ba57/SB0609.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/8/c/228c1302/SB0609.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/e/b/e/2ebec61c/SB0609.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/4/5/b/c45b0f6d/SB0609.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/8/3/0283d235/SB0609.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/2/7/3727a704/SB0609.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/9/c/a/29cac52d/SB0609.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/c/c/b/accb9035/SB0609.04.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/3/0/7830a961/SB0609.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/2/a/3a2a7039/SB0609.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/4/a/d/e4ad9e99/SB0609.178.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/c/9/78c9c059/SB0609.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/4/7/de47d0c1/SB0609.496.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/f/5/dff55af6/SB0609.602.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/0/1/2601bccd/SB0609.644.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback