IN SB0608 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State and local audit examinations. Provides that the uniform compliance guidelines for audit examinations of state and local units conducted by the state board of accounts must include a requirement that the unit disclose any pledge, covenant, or agreement that the unit has made as security or guarantor for a private bond issue of a private company. Requires any entity that: (1) is subject to examination or audit by the state board of accounts; and (2) has made a pledge, covenant, or agreement as security or guarantor for a private bond issue of a private company; to disclose such fact in the notes of the entity's financial statements. Provides that, before a political subdivision that is subject to audit by the state board of accounts may issue or guarantee any debt obligation, the fiscal officer of the political subdivision must first prepare a debt capacity analysis report (report) and present the report to the fiscal body of the political subdivision in a public hearing. Requires the state board of accounts, with the assistance of the department of local government finance, to prescribe a standard form report that must be used by a fiscal officer in the presentation. Requires the report to include a determination of the percentage of the political subdivision's total debt obligations (including guarantees) compared to the political subdivision's prospective revenue available for debt service.
Title
State and local audit examinations. Provides that the uniform compliance guidelines for audit examinations of state and local units conducted by the state board of accounts must include a requirement that the unit disclose any pledge, covenant, or agreement that the unit has made as security or guarantor for a private bond issue of a private company. Requires any entity that: (1) is subject to examination or audit by the state board of accounts; and (2) has made a pledge, covenant, or agreement as security or guarantor for a private bond issue of a private company; to disclose such fact in the notes of the entity's financial statements. Provides that, before a political subdivision that is subject to audit by the state board of accounts may issue or guarantee any debt obligation, the fiscal officer of the political subdivision must first prepare a debt capacity analysis report (report) and present the report to the fiscal body of the political subdivision in a public hearing. Requires the state board of accounts, with the assistance of the department of local government finance, to prescribe a standard form report that must be used by a fiscal officer in the presentation. Requires the report to include a determination of the percentage of the political subdivision's total debt obligations (including guarantees) compared to the political subdivision's prospective revenue available for debt service.
Sponsors
Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Victoria Spartz [R] | Sen. Karen Tallian [D] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] |
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Rep. Timothy Brown [R] | Rep. Todd Huston [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-04 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senator Koch added as coauthor |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as coauthor |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as third author |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Huston |
2019-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Brown T |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 71: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senator Spartz added as second author |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-15 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Authored by Senator Buck |