IN SB0606 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 118
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Teacher salaries. Makes changes to requirements used to determine increases or increments for a teacher salary range.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher salaries. Makes changes to requirements used to determine increases or increments for a teacher salary range.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenatePublic Law 118
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-24HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-17SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 527: yeas 46, nays 0
2019-04-16SenateMotion to concur filed
2019-04-11HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-04-09HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 447: yeas 96, nays 1
2019-04-08HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-28HouseRepresentative Jordan added as cosponsor
2019-03-11HouseRepresentative Bartels added as cosponsor
2019-03-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2019-02-15SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-14SenateSenator Alting added as coauthor
2019-02-12SenateCosponsor: Representative Behning
2019-02-12SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Cook
2019-02-12SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 116: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-02-11SenateSenator Rogers added as coauthor
2019-02-11SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-07SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-31SenateSenator Kruse added as second author
2019-01-15SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2019-01-15SenateAuthored by Senator Raatz

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/606/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/8/d/e/78def7d2/SB0606.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/1/b/fd1bde1b/SB0606.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/b/8/37b8035e/SB0606.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/e/5/dde5dba1/SB0606.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/d/5/25d56362/SB0606.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/4/f/f/94ff4688/SB0606.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/0/0/6b008bb3/SB0606.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/0/2/c80221a0/SB0606.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/1/8/af180d36/SB0606.116.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/b/6/9db6dad5/SB0606.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/2/d/a62d2b27/SB0606.447.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/1/9/55194c15/SB0606.527.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback