IN SB0605 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Senator Glick added as second author
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Indiana-Michigan boundary line commission. Establishes the Indiana-Michigan boundary line commission (commission). Provides that the commission consists of five members appointed by the governor, all of whom must be registered surveyors and one of whom must be from each of the five counties located on the northern border of Indiana (the "boundary counties"). Requires the commission to administer and oversee a survey and remonumentation of the Indiana-Michigan border. Authorizes the commission to procure professional surveying services through the Indiana department of administration. Requires the commission, upon completion of the survey, to submit the survey to the general assembly for ratification. Requires the commission, after the survey is ratified by the general assembly, to file with the state land office and the county recorder's office of each boundary county: (1) a copy of the survey; (2) a written report outlining substantive facts, evidence, and details relating to the survey; and (3) appropriate references, and coordinates based on any coordinate system published by an agency of the state or federal government, for each mile post, each post originally set at or near the shores of lakes or large rivers, and any witness corners as determined in the survey. Provides that the law establishing the commission expires July 1, 2025.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Indiana-Michigan boundary line commission. Establishes the Indiana-Michigan boundary line commission (commission). Provides that the commission consists of five members appointed by the governor, all of whom must be registered surveyors and one of whom must be from each of the five counties located on the northern border of Indiana (the "boundary counties"). Requires the commission to administer and oversee a survey and remonumentation of the Indiana-Michigan border. Authorizes the commission to procure professional surveying services through the Indiana department of administration. Requires the commission, upon completion of the survey, to submit the survey to the general assembly for ratification. Requires the commission, after the survey is ratified by the general assembly, to file with the state land office and the county recorder's office of each boundary county: (1) a copy of the survey; (2) a written report outlining substantive facts, evidence, and details relating to the survey; and (3) appropriate references, and coordinates based on any coordinate system published by an agency of the state or federal government, for each mile post, each post originally set at or near the shores of lakes or large rivers, and any witness corners as determined in the survey. Provides that the law establishing the commission expires July 1, 2025.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11SenateSenator Glick added as second author
2019-02-07SenateCommittee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-15SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
2019-01-15SenateAuthored by Senator Doriot

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback