IN SB0596 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 41
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Public Law 41
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Voluntary preventative programs for juveniles. Provides that the Indiana supreme court may establish a two-year pilot program to assist juvenile court judges in five Indiana counties in providing voluntary preventative programs for at-risk children. Requires nonjudicial state agencies to assist the Indiana supreme court in the implementation of the pilot program. Requires the supreme court office of judicial administration to report to the legislative council specified information regarding the pilot program.
Title
Voluntary preventative programs for juveniles. Provides that the Indiana supreme court may establish a two-year pilot program to assist juvenile court judges in five Indiana counties in providing voluntary preventative programs for at-risk children. Requires nonjudicial state agencies to assist the Indiana supreme court in the implementation of the pilot program. Requires the supreme court office of judicial administration to report to the legislative council specified information regarding the pilot program.
Sponsors
Sen. Victoria Spartz [R] | Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. Andy Zay [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. Donna Schaibley [R] | Rep. Anthony Cook [R] | Rep. Chuck Goodrich [R] | Rep. Edward DeLaney [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Public Law 41 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-03-26 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2019-03-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 345: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2019-03-21 | House | Representative DeLaney added as cosponsor |
2019-03-21 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-03-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Cook and Goodrich |
2019-02-25 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Schaibley |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 202: yeas 42, nays 7 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senator Zay added as coauthor |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as second author |
2019-01-15 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Authored by Senator Spartz |