IN SB0590 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 264
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 264
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Dental matters.
Title
Dental matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-26 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 264 |
2013-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-26 | House | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 632: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2013-04-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 549: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2013-04-17 | House | House advisors appointed: Clere, Shackleford and Bauer |
2013-04-17 | House | House conferees appointed: Bacon and C. Brown |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate advisor appointed: Charbonneau and Stoops |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate conferee appointed: Mishler and Mrvan |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2013-04-11 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2013-04-11 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 462: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2013-04-10 | House | Representatives Porter and C. Brown added as cosponsors |
2013-04-10 | House | Amendment 1 (Bacon), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-10 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-04-08 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-03-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Cosponsor: Rep. Wolkins |
2013-02-19 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Bacon |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 165: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Mishler), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-15 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Authored by Senator Mishler |