IN SB0586 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Law 160
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Law 160
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Regulation of physical therapists. Establishes the Indiana board of physical therapy (board). (Current law regulates physical therapy under the medical licensing board, with certain functions delegated to the Indiana physical therapy committee.) Creates a new definition of "physical therapy" and adds or amends other definitions. Amends certain prohibited acts to include business entities. Adds physician assistants and nurse practitioners to the list of persons who may issue an order to a physical therapist. Allows a physical therapist to treat a patient for 42 days without a referral from a provider. (Current law allows treatment for 24 days.) Provides that certain individuals are exempt from license and certification requirements. Adds a physical therapist assistant to the board and removes the physician member. Establishes requirements for physical therapists and physical therapist assistants who have been educated outside the United States. Establishes requirements to sit for the licensure and certification examinations. Allows the applicant to take the examination not more than six times. Allows the board to disqualify an applicant for certain acts related to the examination. Requires a person who seeks reinstatement for a lapsed license to demonstrate evidence of continuing competence. Establishes certain responsibilities for physical therapists. Allows a physical therapist assistant to work under a physical therapist. Transfers the rules, duties, and records concerning physical therapy from the medical licensing board to the board. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Regulation of physical therapists. Establishes the Indiana board of physical therapy (board). (Current law regulates physical therapy under the medical licensing board, with certain functions delegated to the Indiana physical therapy committee.) Creates a new definition of "physical therapy" and adds or amends other definitions. Amends certain prohibited acts to include business entities. Adds physician assistants and nurse practitioners to the list of persons who may issue an order to a physical therapist. Allows a physical therapist to treat a patient for 42 days without a referral from a provider. (Current law allows treatment for 24 days.) Provides that certain individuals are exempt from license and certification requirements. Adds a physical therapist assistant to the board and removes the physician member. Establishes requirements for physical therapists and physical therapist assistants who have been educated outside the United States. Establishes requirements to sit for the licensure and certification examinations. Allows the applicant to take the examination not more than six times. Allows the board to disqualify an applicant for certain acts related to the examination. Requires a person who seeks reinstatement for a lapsed license to demonstrate evidence of continuing competence. Establishes certain responsibilities for physical therapists. Allows a physical therapist assistant to work under a physical therapist. Transfers the rules, duties, and records concerning physical therapy from the medical licensing board to the board. Makes conforming changes.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] |
Rep. David Frizzell [R] | Rep. Dennis Zent [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. Robin Shackleford [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Public Law 160 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 513: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2019-04-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 402: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2019-04-01 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-19 | House | Representative Shackleford added as cosponsor |
2019-03-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Zent and Clere |
2019-02-19 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Frizzell |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 166: yeas 39, nays 0 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as third author |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senator Freeman removed as second author |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senator Becker added as coauthor |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as second author |
2019-01-15 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Authored by Senator Messmer |