IN SB0586 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 263
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 263
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
IDEM notice procedures.
Title
IDEM notice procedures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-26 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 66 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 263 |
2013-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-26 | House | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 631: yeas 67, nays 25 |
2013-04-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 548: yeas 49, nays 1 |
2013-04-25 | House | House conferee appointed: Zent |
2013-04-25 | House | Representative Moed removed as conferee |
2013-04-09 | House | House advisors appointed: Lehe, Lucas, Dvorak and Errington |
2013-04-09 | House | House conferees appointed: Wolkins and Moed |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate advisor appointed: Leising and Randolph |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate conferee appointed: Charbonneau and Stoops |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2013-03-26 | House | Representative Moed added as cosponsor |
2013-03-26 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2013-03-26 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 357: yeas 77, nays 16 |
2013-03-21 | House | Amendment 1 (Moed), prevailed; Division of the House: yeas 45, nays 31 |
2013-03-21 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-03-18 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Cosponsor: Rep. Lehe |
2013-02-12 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Wolkins |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 122: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Senator Leising added as second author |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-15 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Authored by Senator Charbonneau |