IN SB0585 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 230
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 230
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
State and local administration.
Title
State and local administration.
Sponsors
Sen. Howard Kenley [R] | Sen. Earline Rogers [D] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Dorothy Landske [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 230 |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 568: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Motion to concur in House amendments filed |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Dissent withdrawn |
2013-04-22 | House | Representative V. Smith appointed as House advisor |
2013-04-17 | House | House advisors appointed: Slager, Candelaria Reardon and VanDenburgh |
2013-04-17 | House | House conferees appointed: Soliday and C. Brown |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Kenley, Randolph and Buck |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate conferee appointed: Charbonneau and Rogers |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2013-04-11 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2013-04-11 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 463: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2013-04-10 | House | Amendment 7 (Slager), prevailed; Division of the House: yeas 63, nays 30 |
2013-04-10 | House | Amendment 10 (Porter), withdrawn |
2013-04-10 | House | Amendment 3 (C. Brown), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-10 | House | Amendment 8 (Soliday), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-10 | House | Amendment 6 (Soliday), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-10 | House | Amendment 5 (Soliday), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-10 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-04-08 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-03-07 | House | Representative Niemeyer removed as cosponsor |
2013-03-05 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Cosponsors: Reps. C. Brown, Slager and Niemeyer |
2013-02-26 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Soliday |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 246: yeas 50 and nays 0 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Senator Landske added as coauthor |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as third author |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senator Kenley added as second author |
2013-01-15 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Authored by Senator Charbonneau |